RI H5657 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Education - Curriculum (would Provide For Courses Of Study For Pupils In Grades Kindergarten Through 8 To Prevent Child Abduction, Child Sexual Exploitation, And Abuse.)
Title
An Act Relating To Education - Curriculum (would Provide For Courses Of Study For Pupils In Grades Kindergarten Through 8 To Prevent Child Abduction, Child Sexual Exploitation, And Abuse.)
Sponsors
Rep. Raymond Johnston [D] | Rep. Patrick O'Neil [D] | Rep. Mary Messier [D] | Rep. Raymond Hull [D] |
Rep. Scott Guthrie [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-13 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-03-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/13/2013) |
2013-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H5657.pdf |