RI H5637 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Defines coinsurance and prohibits insurance contracts or policies from using coinsurance to calculate and collect additional funds from patients, including mental health and substance abuse patients.
Title
Insurance Coverage For Mental Health And Substance Abuse Disorders
Sponsors
Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] | Rep. Raymond Johnston [D] | Rep. Cale Keable [D] | Rep. Grace Diaz [D] |
Rep. David Bennett [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-04 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-31 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2017) |
2017-03-25 | House | Meeting postponed (03/28/2017) |
2017-03-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2017-03-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5637.pdf |