RI H5617 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-15 - Referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs
Pending: Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-15 - Referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs
Pending: Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the service requirement for admissions to RI Veterans' Home from 90 days to 2 years, and gives priority to veterans defined as war veterans.
Title
Rhode Island Veterans' Home
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-25 - House - Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-15 | Senate | Referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
2023-05-25 | House | House read and passed |
2023-05-19 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/25/2023) |
2023-05-11 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2023-05-05 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/11/2023) |
2023-03-16 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-03-14 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/16/2023) |
2023-03-14 | House | Meeting postponed (03/14/2023) |
2023-03-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2023-02-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House Veterans Affairs |