RI H5615 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-25 - Placed on House Calendar (06/25/2015)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-25 - Placed on House Calendar (06/25/2015)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allows owners of a free standing townhouse style condominium unit, with supportive condominium documents, to alter their unit beyond its existing footprint and/or unit boundaries.
Title
Alteration Of Units
Sponsors
Rep. Cale Keable [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-25 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/25/2015) |
2015-06-25 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2015-06-25 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/25/2015) |
2015-03-18 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-03-13 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/18/2015) |
2015-02-25 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/HouseText15/H5615.pdf |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/HouseText15/H5615A.pdf |