RI H5573 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Makes amendments providing for additional reporting duties and requirements for persons with knowledge of mistreatment or neglect of elders.
Title
Abuse In Health Care Facilities
Sponsors
Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. Robert Jacquard [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Grace Diaz [D] |
Rep. Evan Shanley [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-28 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Abuse in health care facilities approval of amendment (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Abuse in health care facilities approval of amendment (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-28 | House | House passed as amended in concurrence |
2019-06-28 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/28/2019) |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Senate passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/27/2019) |
2019-06-26 | House | House read and passed |
2019-06-24 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/26/2019) |
2019-06-24 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2019-06-21 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/24/2019) |
2019-03-13 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/13/2019) |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |