RI H5572 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-26 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (05/28/2015)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-26 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (05/28/2015)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts from the sales and use tax, the purchase and use of telecommunication products or services that are necessary for internet access.
Title
Sales And Use Taxes - Liability And Computation
Sponsors
Rep. Sherry Roberts [R] | Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] | Rep. Blake Filippi [R] | Rep. Robert Lancia [R] |
Rep. Robert Nardolillo [R] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-26 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (05/28/2015) |
2015-05-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2015-05-12 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (05/12/2015) |
2015-05-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2015-02-25 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/HouseText15/H5572.pdf |
Roll Call | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/SVotes/votereport.asp?id=8196 |