RI H5566 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit moral obligation bonds not secured by the full faith and credit of the state (RI Constitution VI:16) or secured by revenues (RI Constitution VI:17)
Title
Public Corporation Debt Management
Sponsors
Rep. Patricia Morgan [R] | Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] | Rep. Blake Filippi [R] | Rep. Antonio Giarrusso [R] |
Rep. Sherry Roberts [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-13 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-05-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/13/2015) |
2015-02-25 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/HouseText15/H5566.pdf |