RI H5547 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-25 - House passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-25 - House passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Permits the division of motor vehicles to create a special registration plate for state public colleges and universities.
Title
Registration Of Vehicles
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-25 - House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-25 | House | House passed Sub A |
2015-06-25 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/25/2015) |
2015-06-22 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2015-06-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/22/2015) |
2015-05-14 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-05-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/14/2015) |
2015-02-25 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |