RI H5462 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Moves state employee public safety professionals from the state retirement system to the municipal retirement system, effective July 1, 2017. It sets their retirement contribution to 10% of their compensation.
Title
Relating To Public Officers And Employees
Sponsors
Rep. William O'Brien [D] | Rep. Robert Craven [D] | Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] | Rep. Kenneth Marshall [D] |
Rep. Cale Keable [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-04-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/03/2017) |
2017-02-09 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5462.pdf |