RI H5459 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Opposing Further Implementation Of The Real Id Act
Title
House Resolution Opposing Further Implementation Of The Real Id Act
Sponsors
Rep. Sherry Roberts [R] | Rep. Jared Nunes [D] | Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] | Rep. Marvin Abney [D] |
Rep. Blake Filippi [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-08 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-04-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/08/2015) |
2015-02-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/HouseText15/H5459.pdf |