RI H5455 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the attorney general and/or aggrieved persons to file a bad faith patent infringement suit seeking equitable and/or monetary relief including punitive damages in connection with frivolous patent infringement claims.
Title
Relating To Commercial Law - General Regulatory Provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Kennedy [D] | Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Mia Ackerman [D] | Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] |
Rep. Eileen Naughton [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-24 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-03-20 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/24/2015) |
2015-02-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/HouseText15/H5455.pdf |