RI H5391 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts the amount of military pension which is included in federal adjusted gross income from the state income tax.
Title
Personal Income Tax
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Lancia [R] | Rep. Sherry Roberts [R] | Rep. Kenneth Marshall [D] | Rep. Marvin Abney [D] |
Rep. Brian Newberry [R] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Approval of amendment lc 01100/3 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-28 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-05-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/28/2015) |
2015-02-11 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |