RI H5391 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Taxation-levy And Assessment Of Local Taxes-central Falls (would Authorize The City Council Of The City Of Central Falls To Increase The Amount Of Time For Tax Exemptions For Certain Improvements To Qualifying Real And Personal Property From 5 Years To 10 Years, And The Amount From $20,000 To $25,000)
Title
An Act Relating To Taxation-levy And Assessment Of Local Taxes-central Falls (would Authorize The City Council Of The City Of Central Falls To Increase The Amount Of Time For Tax Exemptions For Certain Improvements To Qualifying Real And Personal Property From 5 Years To 10 Years, And The Amount From $20,000 To $25,000)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-17 | House | Signed by Governor |
2013-06-12 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-06-12 | Senate | House passed as amended in concurrence |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Placed on House Calendar (06/12/2013) |
2013-06-06 | House | Senate passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2013-06-04 | House | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/06/2013) |
2013-05-30 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2013-05-24 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/30/2013) |
2013-05-22 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-05-20 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/22/2013) |
2013-05-15 | House | Committee heard |
2013-05-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/15/2013) |
2013-04-25 | House | Referred to Senate Finance |
2013-04-11 | House | House read and passed |
2013-04-04 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/11/2013) |
2013-04-04 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2013-03-29 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/04/2013) |
2013-03-14 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-02-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/14/2013) |
2013-02-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H5391.pdf |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H5391aa.pdf |