TN SB2012 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 24 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Transmitted to Governor for action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 24 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Transmitted to Governor for action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, broadens the electronic health care records modernization act to include subjecting healthcare entities to injunctive relief and civil penalties for interfering with their patients accessing electronic health information and prohibiting healthcare entities from disclosing electronic health reports or tests to patients until 72 hours after the results have been finalized in certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 47; Title 56; Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8; Title 47; Title 56; Title 63 and Title 68, relative to health records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-04-24 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-04-22 | House | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2024-04-22 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0954) |
2024-04-22 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-04-10 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0868) |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/8/2024 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/13/2024 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/13/2024 |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/12/2024 |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2011 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-22 - Sponsor(s) Added.