CT HJ00217 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-02 - Senate Calendar Number 417
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-02 - Senate Calendar Number 417
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution Ratifying The Proposed Amendment To The Constitution Of The United States Permitting Congress To Regulate Child Labor.
Title
Resolution Ratifying The Proposed Amendment To The Constitution Of The United States Permitting Congress To Regulate Child Labor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 95 (Y: 88 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-03-22 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-22 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-02 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 417 |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-30 | House | Adopted, House |
2024-04-10 | House | File Number 425 |
2024-04-10 | House | House Calendar Number 281 |
2024-04-10 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-10 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-04 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-25 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-22 | House | Joint Favorable |
2024-03-04 | House | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2024-03-01 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |