CA AB2400 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
Pending: Assembly Revenue and Taxation Committee
Hearing: Apr 29 @ 2:30 pm in State Capitol, Room 126
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
Pending: Assembly Revenue and Taxation Committee
Hearing: Apr 29 @ 2:30 pm in State Capitol, Room 126
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 26003 and 26011.8 of the Public Resources Code, and to amend Section 6010.8 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to public resources, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
California Alternative Energy and Advanced Transportation Financing Authority Act.
Sponsors
Asm. Luz Rivas [D] | Asm. Laurie Davies [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2024-04-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2024-04-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 1). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2024-04-02 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-03-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Coms. on TRANS. and REV. & TAX. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2024-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and TRANS. |
2024-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 14. |
2024-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 26003 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 26011.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 6010.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |