RI H5382 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits on any school campus the advertising of any food or beverage that may not be sold on the campus during the school day.
Title
Relating To Education-unhealthy Food And Beverage Advertising
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] |
Rep. Eileen Naughton [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-25 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-02-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/25/2015) |
2015-02-11 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/HouseText15/H5382.pdf |