RI H5364 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-20 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-20 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends the sales tax exemption of a manufacturer who processes raw materials into finished goods.
Title
Sales And Use Taxes -- Liability And Computation
Sponsors
Rep. Gregg Amore [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-05-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/20/2021) |
2021-02-05 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5364.pdf |