RI H5286 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expands the definition of fire fighter to a member of a fire department or a city, town or fire district emergency medical services unit.
Title
Cancer Benefits For Fire Fighters
Sponsors
Rep. Mia Ackerman [D] | Rep. Brandon Voas [D] | Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] | Rep. Kathleen Fogarty [D] |
Rep. Teresa Tanzi [D] | Rep. Alex Marszalkowski [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-08 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-19 | House | Signed by Governor |
2023-06-14 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/13/2023) |
2023-06-08 | House | House read and passed |
2023-06-06 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/08/2023) |
2023-06-06 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2023-06-02 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/06/2023) |
2023-03-28 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-03-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2023) |
2023-02-14 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (02/16/2023) |
2023-02-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2023-02-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |