CA SB983 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-02 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-02 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 25239 of the Public Resources Code, relating to energy.
Title
Energy: gasoline stations and alternative fuel infrastructure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB983 Wahab et al (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB983 Wahab et al (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-24 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2024-06-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on U. & E. and TRANS. |
2024-05-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4061.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3966.) (May 16). |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2024-05-06 | Senate | May 6 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3732.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 3348.) (March 19). |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Set for hearing March 19. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and L. GOV. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 29. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 25239 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |