CA SB1182 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-22 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-22 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 16 (commencing with Section 25993) to Division 15 of the Public Resources Code, relating to school facilities.
Title
Master Plan for Healthy, Sustainable, and Climate-Resilient Schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-08-27 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1182 Gonzalez et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-08-26 - Assembly - SB 1182 Gonzalez Senate Third Reading By Ting (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1182 Gonzalez et al (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-08-26 - Assembly - SB 1182 Gonzalez Senate Third Reading By Ting (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1182 Gonzalez et al (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-22 | Senate | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. |
2024-09-22 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor. |
2024-09-03 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2024-08-27 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2024-08-26 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2024-08-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 1. Page 6536.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2024-08-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (August 15). |
2024-08-07 | Assembly | August 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2024-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-26 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-06-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-06-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 17). |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and ED. |
2024-05-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4092.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3974.) (May 16). |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | April 15 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3466.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Set for hearing April 3. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 17. Noes 0. Page 3349.) (March 19). Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Set for hearing March 19. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and ED. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 25993 | New Code | See Bill Text |