RI H5249 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifies depreciation with respect to the net book value of a company's tangible personal property, by providing that the accumulated depreciation reduction takes into account physical deterioration and functional and economic obsolescence.
Title
Relating To Taxation-- Public Service Corporation Tax
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-06 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-06-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/06/2017) |
2017-01-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5249.pdf |