RI H5247 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that no party would be deemed jointly liable in tort for an injury to person or property unless it is determined that such person is at least fifty-one percent (51%) liable in tort for the injury.
Title
Procedure In Particular Actions
Sponsors
Rep. Patricia Morgan [R] | Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] | Rep. Antonio Giarrusso [R] | Rep. Robert Nardolillo [R] |
Rep. Sherry Roberts [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-24 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-03-20 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/24/2015) |
2015-03-02 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/03/2015) |
2015-02-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/HouseText15/H5247.pdf |