RI H5216 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
SEE TITLE 16 CHAPTER 97 - THE RHODE ISLAND BOARD OF EDUCATION ACT) (Requires charter schools that disenroll or return a student to the sending prior to the end of an academic year, to return all public received by the charter school to educate that student for that academic year.
Title
Funding Of Charter Public Schools
Sponsors
Rep. William O'Brien [D] | Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] | Rep. Katherine Kazarian [D] | Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] |
Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Edith Ajello [D] | Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] | Rep. Gregg Amore [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/23/2021) |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5216.pdf |