RI H5195 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the E-Verify compliance act which would require all non-governmental employers within the state with three (3) or more employees to apply to participate in the federal E-Verify program.
Title
Relating To Labor And Labor Relations
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Nardolillo [R] | Rep. Robert Quattrocchi [R] | Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] | Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] |
Rep. Justin Price [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/09/2017) |
2017-01-25 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5195.pdf |