RI H5182 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the use of a non-hands-free personal wireless communication device while operating a motor vehicle, except for public safety personnel or in an emergency situation, and would provide for monetary fines for violations.
Title
Mobile Telephone Use
Sponsors
Rep. Kathleen Fogarty [D] | Rep. Teresa Tanzi [D] | Rep. Aaron Regunberg [D] | Rep. Lauren Carson [D] |
Rep. Shelby Maldonado [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-28 - House - Passage (Y: 56 N: 8 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-27 | House | Signed by Governor |
2017-09-25 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (09/19/2017) |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/30/2017) |
2017-06-28 | House | House read and passed |
2017-06-28 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/28/2017) |
2017-06-20 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2017-06-16 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2017) |
2017-03-08 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/08/2017) |
2017-02-03 | House | Meeting postponed (02/07/2017) |
2017-02-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2017-01-19 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |