RI H5128 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides veterans' exemption status for the property of certain persons who served in the National Guard.
Title
Relating To Taxation
Sponsors
Rep. Jared Nunes [D] | Rep. Robert Jacquard [D] | Rep. Michael Marcello [D] | Rep. Joy Hearn [D] |
Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-12 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-02-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/12/2015) |
2015-01-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/HouseText15/H5128.pdf |