RI H5125 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes cities and towns to enact ordinances to address and protect their citizens' public safety and welfare from the impact of hemp cultivation and any of its derivative products.
Title
Hemp Growth Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-11 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-02-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/11/2021) |
2021-02-01 | House | Committee transferred to House Municipal Government & Housing |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5125.pdf |