RI H5119 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Limits persons convicted of certain persons domestic offenses from purchasing or owning firearms.
Title
Weapons
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-14 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-04-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/14/2015) |
2015-01-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/HouseText15/H5119.pdf |
Roll Call | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/SVotes/votereport.asp?id=7909 |