RI H5116 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-28 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request (05/28/2015)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-28 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request (05/28/2015)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a financial incentive for business entities to create new jobs by offering a business tax reduction.
Title
Rhode Island New Qualified Jobs Incentive Act Of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Deborah Ruggiero [D] | Rep. Joseph Trillo [R] | Rep. Mia Ackerman [D] |
Rep. Kenneth Marshall [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-28 | House | Withdrawn at sponsor's request (05/28/2015) |
2015-05-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2015-01-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/HouseText15/H5116.pdf |