RI H5114 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the collection of a sales or use tax on that portion of a motor vehicle lease payment representing taxes payable by the lessor on the leased motor vehicle.
Title
Sales And Use Taxes--liability And Computation
Sponsors
Rep. Raymond Hull [D] | Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] |
Rep. Thomas Winfield [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-05-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/12/2015) |
2015-01-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/HouseText15/H5114.pdf |