RI H5066 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend the civil penalty for possession of one ounce or less of marijuana.
Title
Uniform Controlled Substances Act - Offenses And Penalties
Sponsors
Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Edith Ajello [D] | Rep. Scott Slater [D] | Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] |
Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-29 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-04-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/29/2015) |
2015-01-14 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/HouseText15/H5066.pdf |