RI H5061 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Motor And Other Vehicles -- Passing, Using Of Lanes, And Rules Of The Road (would Create Additional Penalties For Motor Vehicle Violations At Intersections And Rights-of-way That Cause Serious Bodily Injury Or Death)
Title
An Act Relating To Motor And Other Vehicles -- Passing, Using Of Lanes, And Rules Of The Road (would Create Additional Penalties For Motor Vehicle Violations At Intersections And Rights-of-way That Cause Serious Bodily Injury Or Death)
Sponsors
Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] | Rep. Jan Malik [D] | Rep. Thomas Palangio [D] | Rep. Stephen Ucci [D] |
Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-15 | House | Signed by Governor |
2013-07-10 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/27/2013) |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/18/2013) |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2013-05-21 | House | House passed Sub A |
2013-05-09 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/21/2013) |
2013-05-08 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2013-05-03 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/08/2013) |
2013-05-01 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-04-26 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/01/2013) |
2013-03-05 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-03-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/05/2013) |
2013-01-10 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H5061.pdf |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H5061A.pdf |