RI H5057 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts social security income from state personal income tax.
Title
Personal Income Tax
Sponsors
Rep. Doreen Costa [R] | Rep. Robert Lancia [R] | Rep. Robert Nardolillo [R] | Rep. Blake Filippi [R] |
Rep. Daniel Reilly [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-28 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-05-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/28/2015) |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/HouseText15/H5057.pdf |