RI H5034 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allows state employees who had also been a correctional officer to elect to combine their service time earned from each job, for the determination of their retirement eligibility date and calculation of retirement benefits.
Title
Retirement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-28 - House - Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-28 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-28 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-15 | House | Signed by Governor |
2019-07-11 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/28/2019) |
2019-06-28 | House | House passed Sub A |
2019-06-26 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/28/2019) |
2019-06-26 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-06-26 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2019-06-24 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/26/2019) |
2019-04-30 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/30/2019) |
2019-01-04 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |