PA SB603 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-21 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-21 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in school health services, further providing for health services.
Title
In school health services, further providing for health services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-10-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 603 PN 1160, Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-10-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A02571 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-28 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt Amendment A02165 (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-28 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A02571 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-28 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt Amendment A02165 (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-28 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-21 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |
2021-10-19 | House | In the House |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-1) |
2021-10-18 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2021-09-29 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-09-29 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-09-28 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |