PA SB48 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-07-13 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-07-13 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act providing for the acquisition and operation of the Horsham Joint Interagency Installation and limitation on use of installation.
Title
Providing for the acquisition and operation of the Horsham Joint Interagency Installation and limitation on use of installation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-27 - Senate - SB 48 PN 33, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-13 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-07-13 | Removed from table | |
2009-07-08 | Laid on the table | |
2009-07-08 | First consideration | |
2009-07-08 | Reported as amended | |
2009-06-01 | Referred to TRANSPORTATION | |
2009-06-01 | Reported with request to re-refer to TRANSPORTATION | |
2009-04-29 | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS | |
2009-04-27 | In the House | |
2009-04-27 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-04-21 | Second consideration | |
2009-04-20 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-03-23 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-03-18 | First consideration | |
2009-03-18 | Reported as committed | |
2009-01-20 | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |