PA SB432 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-14 - Referred to COMMERCE
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-14 - Referred to COMMERCE
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 15, 1933 (P.L.565, No.111), known as the Department of Banking and Securities Code, in banking and securities, further providing for fund.
Title
In banking and securities, further providing for fund.
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Laughlin [R] | Sen. Patrick Stefano [R] | Sen. Judith Ward [R] | Sen. Lisa Baker [R] |
Sen. Robert Mensch [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 432 PN 617, Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-14 | House | Referred to COMMERCE |
2021-05-12 | House | In the House |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-04-19 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE |