PA SB327 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 18-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of August 9, 1955 (P.L.323, No.130), known as The County Code, in coroner, further providing for coroner's investigation.
Title
In coroner, further providing for coroner's investigation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 327 PN 902, Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Senate Local Government: A01656 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Senate Local Government: A01656 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2022-02-07 | House | In the House |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (33-16) |
2021-12-14 | Senate | Removed from table |
2021-12-14 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2021-10-18 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-06-15 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |