PA SB319 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-21 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-21 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 2, 1915 (P.L.736, No.338), known as the Workers' Compensation Act, in liability and compensation, further providing for compensable injuries, subrogation and proration.
Title
In liability and compensation, further providing for compensable injuries, subrogation and proration.
Sponsors
Sen. Camera Bartolotta [R] | Sen. Lisa Baker [R] | Sen. Joe Pittman [R] | Sen. Patrick Stefano [R] |
Sen. Cris Dush [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-09-21 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 319 PN 327, Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Committed (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 319 PN 327, Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Committed (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-09-21 | House | First consideration |
2022-09-21 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-06-15 | House | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |
2021-06-14 | House | In the House |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (27-23) |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-04-27 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |