PA SB304 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Act No. 67
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Act No. 67
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 15 (Corporations and Unincorporated Associations) and 54 (Names) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in Title 15, making extensive revisions, additions and deletions to preliminary material on general provisions; to corporation material on general provisions, on incorporation, on corporate powers, duties and safeguards, on officers, directors and shareholders, on fundamental changes, on registered corporations, on insurance corporations, on benefit corporations, on foreign business corporations, on incorporation and on foreign nonprofit corporations; to material on limited liability companies; to material on unincorporated associations; and to material on business trusts; in Title 54, further providing for general provisions and for corporate and other association names; and making related repeals.
Title
In Title 15, making extensive revisions, additions and deletions to preliminary material on general provisions; to corporation material on general provisions, on incorporation, on corporate powers, duties and safeguards, on officers, directors and shareholders, on fundamental changes, on registered corporations, on insurance corporations, on benefit corporations, on foreign business corporations, on incorporation and on foreign nonprofit corporations; to material on limited liability companies; to material on unincorporated associations; and to material on business trusts; in Title 54, further providing for general provisions and for corporate and other association names; and making related repeals.
Sponsors
Sen. Stewart Greenleaf [R] | Sen. Richard Alloway [R] | Sen. Jim Ferlo [D] | Sen. Patrick Browne [R] |
Sen. Dominic Pileggi [R] | Sen. James Brewster [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-29 - Senate - SB 304 PN 1210, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-28 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-18 - House - SB 304 PN 1210, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - House - SB 304 PN 1172, 2013 A2035, ROSS (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - Senate - SB 304 PN 212, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-28 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-18 - House - SB 304 PN 1210, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - House - SB 304 PN 1172, 2013 A2035, ROSS (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - Senate - SB 304 PN 212, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-09 | Senate | Act No. 67 |
2013-07-09 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2013-06-30 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2013-06-30 | Senate | Signed in House |
2013-06-29 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2013-06-29 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (49-0) |
2013-06-28 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2013-06-18 | Senate | In the Senate |
2013-06-18 | House | Third consideration and final passage (197-0) |
2013-06-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-06-11 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-06-11 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2013-06-10 | House | Removed from table |
2013-06-05 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-06-05 | House | First consideration |
2013-06-05 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-05-08 | House | Referred to COMMERCE |
2013-05-06 | House | In the House |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Second consideration |
2013-01-29 | Senate | First consideration |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |