PA SB236 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Engrossed on October 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-26 - Referred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS
Pending: House Consumer Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-26 - Referred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS
Pending: House Consumer Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 4, 1996 (P.L.911, No.147), known as the Telemarketer Registration Act, further providing for definitions, for unlawful acts and penalties and for unwanted telephone solicitation calls prohibited.
Title
Further providing for definitions, for unlawful acts and penalties and for unwanted telephone solicitation calls prohibited.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-10-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 236 PN 1102, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-10-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 236 PN 205, Motion to agree to the Bill on Second Consideration (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 236 PN 205, Motion to agree to the Bill on Second Consideration (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-26 | House | Referred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS |
2021-10-25 | House | In the House |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2021-10-18 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2021-09-27 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-09-27 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Removed from table |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Second consideration, *Opening vote* June 10, 2021 (50-0) |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Removed from table |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2021-03-23 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |