PA SB1422 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Introduced on June 24 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-10-14 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 24 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-10-14 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 1, 1988 (P.L.82, No.16), known as the Pennsylvania Infrastructure Investment Authority Act, further providing for definitions, for financial assistance and for annual report.
Title
Further providing for definitions, for financial assistance and for annual report.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-10-14 | Laid on the table | |
2010-09-22 | First consideration | |
2010-09-22 | Reported as amended | |
2010-06-24 | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |