PA SB1277 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-30 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-30 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in terms and courses of study, providing for parental notification relating to instructional materials and books containing sexually explicit content.
Title
In terms and courses of study, providing for parental notification relating to instructional materials and books containing sexually explicit content.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1277 PN 1832, Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1277 PN 1738, 2021 A5183, BOSCOLA Amendment No. A-5183 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1277 PN 1738, 2021 A5183, BOSCOLA Amendment No. A-5183 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |
2022-06-29 | House | In the House |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (30-20) |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Amended on third consideration (49-0) |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-06-21 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2022-06-10 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |