PA SB1206 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on December 7 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-01-14 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Status: Introduced on December 7 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-01-14 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 11, 1923 (P.L.1044, No.425), referred to as the Prisoner Transfer Law, further providing for transfer of inmates.
Title
An Act amending the act of July 11, 1923 (P.L.1044, No.425), referred to as the Prisoner Transfer Law, further providing for transfer of inmates.
Sponsors
Sen. Jay Costa [D] | Sen. Jim Ferlo [D] | Sen. Wayne Fontana [D] | Sen. Vincent Hughes [D] |
Sen. Shirley Kitchen [D] | Sen. Michael O'Pake [D] | Sen. Barry Stout [D] | Sen. Leanna Washington [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-01-14 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-12-10 | First consideration | |
2007-12-10 | Reported as committed | |
2007-12-07 | Referred to JUDICIARY |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=1206 |