PA SB1155 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-10-12 - Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
Pending: Senate Rules & Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-10-12 - Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
Pending: Senate Rules & Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Title 16 (Counties) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, adding provisions for required fiscal security through bonding, blanket bonding and insuring of elected and appointed county officers and employees; providing for determining the form, amount and payment of premiums for and the filing and recording of the required security, for the subsequent issuance of official commissions, for the effects of natural gas drilling and for a Marcellus Shale Job Creation Tax Credit; and making related repeals.
Title
Adding provisions for required fiscal security through bonding, blanket bonding and insuring of elected and appointed county officers and employees; providing for determining the form, amount and payment of premiums for and the filing and recording of the required security, for the subsequent issuance of official commissions, for the effects of natural gas drilling and for a Marcellus Shale Job Creation Tax Credit; and making related repeals.
Sponsors
Sen. John Eichelberger [R] | Sen. Edwin Erickson [R] | Sen. Robert Robbins [R] | Sen. Barry Stout [D] |
Sen. John Wozniak [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-09-29 - House - SB 1155 PN 2232, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 104 N: 94 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-09-28 - House - SB 1155 PN 2221, 2010 A9246, SUSP RULES, SAYLOR (Y: 104 N: 95 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-05 - Senate - SB 1155 PN 1922, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-09-28 - House - SB 1155 PN 2221, 2010 A9246, SUSP RULES, SAYLOR (Y: 104 N: 95 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-05 - Senate - SB 1155 PN 1922, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-10-12 | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS | |
2010-09-29 | In the Senate | |
2010-09-29 | Final passage | |
2010-09-28 | Third consideration, with amendments | |
2010-09-27 | Re-reported as amended | |
2010-09-22 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-09-20 | Second consideration | |
2010-09-20 | Re-reported as committed | |
2010-06-14 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-06-14 | Removed from table | |
2010-06-09 | Laid on the table | |
2010-06-09 | First consideration | |
2010-06-09 | Reported as committed | |
2010-05-06 | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT | |
2010-05-05 | In the House | |
2010-05-05 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-05-03 | Second consideration, with amendments | |
2010-04-12 | Re-reported as committed | |
2010-02-02 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-12-16 | First consideration | |
2009-12-16 | Reported as committed | |
2009-12-14 | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |