PA SB1056 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - Act No. 3A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - Act No. 3A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act making an appropriation from the Public School Employees' Retirement Fund to provide for expenses of the Public School Employees' Retirement Board for the fiscal year July 1, 2011, to June 30, 2012, and for the payment of bills incurred and remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2011.
Title
Making an appropriation from the Public School Employees' Retirement Fund to provide for expenses of the Public School Employees' Retirement Board for the fiscal year July 1, 2011, to June 30, 2012, and for the payment of bills incurred and remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2011.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-30 - House - SB 1056 PN 1192, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-06-06 - Senate - SB 1056 PN 1192, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-06 - Senate - SB 1056 PN 1192, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-30 | House | Act No. 3A |
2011-06-30 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2011-06-30 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2011-06-30 | House | Signed in House |
2011-06-30 | House | Signed in Senate |
2011-06-30 | House | Third consideration and final passage (198-0) |
2011-06-23 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2011-06-21 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-06-21 | House | Second consideration |
2011-06-20 | House | Removed from table |
2011-06-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-06-14 | House | First consideration |
2011-06-14 | House | Reported as committed |
2011-06-07 | House | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-06-06 | House | In the House |
2011-06-06 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2011-05-24 | Senate | Second consideration |
2011-05-23 | Senate | First consideration |
2011-05-23 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2011-05-10 | Senate | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |