PA SB1047 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on July 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-07 - Act No. 48 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on July 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-07 - Act No. 48 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 51 (Military Affairs) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in general provisions, further providing for definitions; and, in State Armory Board, providing for definitions, further providing for composition and general functions, for erection of armories and for management of armories, providing for management of buildings and structures located at Fort Indiantown Gap and further providing for purchase or lease of ground for armories, for donation of land by political subdivisions, for donation of property and services by political subdivisions, for sale of unusable armories and land, sale or lease of timber and mineral rights, for payment of armory rentals by Commonwealth, for rental of armories, for property in armories of units in Federal service, for State Treasury Armory Fund and for maintenance, construction and repairs.
Title
In general provisions, further providing for definitions; and, in State Armory Board, providing for definitions, further providing for composition and general functions, for erection of armories and for management of armories, providing for management of buildings and structures located at Fort Indiantown Gap and further providing for purchase or lease of ground for armories, for donation of land by political subdivisions, for donation of property and services by political subdivisions, for sale of unusable armories and land, sale or lease of timber and mineral rights, for payment of armory rentals by Commonwealth, for rental of armories, for property in armories of units in Federal service, for State Treasury Armory Fund and for maintenance, construction and repairs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1047 PN 1775, Concur in House Amendments (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - House - House Floor: SB 1047 PN 1775, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A04642 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1047 PN 1375, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A03617 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - House - House Floor: SB 1047 PN 1775, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A04642 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1047 PN 1375, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A03617 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-07 | Senate | Act No. 48 of 2022 |
2022-07-07 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Signed in House |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (50-0) |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2022-06-27 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-06-27 | House | Third consideration and final passage (200-0) |
2022-06-27 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-06-22 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-22 | House | Second consideration |
2022-06-21 | House | Removed from table |
2022-06-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-06-15 | House | First consideration |
2022-06-15 | House | Reported as amended |
2022-04-14 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2022-04-12 | House | In the House |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |