PA SB1043 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-21 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-21 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 3, 1978 (P.L.6, No.3), known as the Steel Products Procurement Act, further providing for payments under contracts by requiring centralized portal for electronic submission of documentation.
Title
Further providing for payments under contracts by requiring centralized portal for electronic submission of documentation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-21 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A04914 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1043 PN 1366, Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A04914 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1043 PN 1366, Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-09-21 | House | Removed from table |
2022-06-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-06-21 | House | First consideration |
2022-06-21 | House | Reported as amended |
2022-05-24 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2022-05-23 | House | In the House |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (47-0) |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |