PA SB1030 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-06 - Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
Pending: House Environmental Resources & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-06 - Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
Pending: House Environmental Resources & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act providing for suspension of the Pennsylvania Heavy-Duty Diesel Emissions Control Program and for expiration of suspension.
Title
Providing for suspension of the Pennsylvania Heavy-Duty Diesel Emissions Control Program and for expiration of suspension.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1030 PN 1337, Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | House | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |
2022-04-04 | House | In the House |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (31-18) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-01-25 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |